+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5974.).
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4378.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5113.)
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 20.
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2014: AB 2753 H. & C.D. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By CHAU
- Yeas: 79
August 7, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2753 Committee on H. & C.D.(Chau)
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 11
May 23, 2014: AB 2753 H. & C.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
May 14, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (7)
Committee on Housing and Community Development
Type:
Primary Sponsor