+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6443.).
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5313.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29).
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E.Q.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 5240.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5167.)
- Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 2).
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5076.)
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 5138.)
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 4994.)
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- May 27-Motion to reconsider continued.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gatto.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 32. Page 4692.).
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 26).
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2016: AB 2748 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2748 Gatto By Monning
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
June 29, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 21, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2016: AB 2748 GATTO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 18
April 26, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor