+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26).
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5612.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25).
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
June 20, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 31, 2018: AB 2747 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor