+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 284, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6358.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5285.).
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5300.)
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 20, 2018: AB 2746 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Special Consent AB2746
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 27, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 25, 2018: AB 2746 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
May 7, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor