+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5428.).
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4792.)
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2020: AB 2746 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 30, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2746 Gabriel et al. By Hurtado
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 17, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 10, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 10, 2020: AB 2746 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
May 20, 2020: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor