+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor