+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 210, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4300.).
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 4705.)
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 9).
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2743 Committee on L. & E. (R.Hernández By Hueso
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
June 11, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 1, 2014: AB 2743 L. & E. Assembly Third Reading By HERNÁNDEZ
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 7
April 9, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 2, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Committee on Labor and Employment
Type:
Primary Sponsor