+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26).
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
On January 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
On January 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
March 26, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor