+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6536.).
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 25).
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4555.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4641.)
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 27, 2014: AB 2736 HIGHER ED. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WILLIAMS
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 25, 2014: Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
August 18, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2736 Committee on HIGHER ED. (Williams By Lara
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 18, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2014: AB 2736 HIGHER ED. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2014: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 1, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (11)
Committee on Higher Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor