+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 217, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5843.).
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4257.).
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4851.)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2014: AB 2732 INS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By PEREA
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2014: Special Consent #18 AB2732 Committee on INS. (Perea)
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 11, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
May 8, 2014: AB 2732 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
April 2, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Committee on Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor