+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 743, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6728.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6725.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6725.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4975.).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 29).
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 4952.)
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1,
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4952.)
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4952.)
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4429.)
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
On February 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 29, 2014: AB 2731 PEREA Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 29, 2014: Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB2731 Perea By Hueso Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 29, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2014: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2014: AB 2731 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
April 2, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor