+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 1, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor