+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On January 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
On January 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 27, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor