+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 23, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor