+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 16, 2024 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 17, 2024 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 9, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 15, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 14, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 9, 2024: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor