+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6067.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 6056.)
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4943.).
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29).
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and GOV. & F.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 3. Page 4259.)
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 4).
On March 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2022: AB 2721 Lee Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
August 22, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2721 Lee By Cortese
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 29, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 1, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2022: AB 2721 Lee Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
April 4, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor