+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2051.).
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1335.)
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On February 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
On February 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 17, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB272 Lackey By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 7, 2015: AB 272 LACKEY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
April 29, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor