+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 2. Page 6142.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6114.)
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 1. Page 5011.).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E., U. & C.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4914.)
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on C. & C.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2022: AB 2716 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 19
August 23, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2716 Grayson By Dodd
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
June 27, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
May 25, 2022: AB 2716 Grayson Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 8
May 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 27, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor