+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5042.)
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2016: AB 2714 COOPER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 27, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 20
March 30, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor