+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on third reading file.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5197.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From consent calendar.
- Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-referral to the Com. on L. GOV.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4575.)
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 7
May 27, 2014: AB 2712 DALY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 14, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
April 29, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1