+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 323, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6375.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5290.).
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 20, 2018: AB 2705 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2705 Holden By Hill
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 11, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2018: AB 2705 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
April 11, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 3, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor