+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 855.).
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 3).
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
April 9, 2015: AB 27 CHÁVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2015: AB 27 CHÁVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs]
- Yeas: 13
March 3, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor