+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2967.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2531.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1896.).
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1708.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2021: AB 27 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB27 Luz Rivas et al. By Skinner Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 7, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
July 7, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 3, 2021: AB 27 Luz Rivas Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
March 24, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor