+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.)
On May 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and E.M.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 26, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2