+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6658.).
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5659.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5489.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11).
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 27, 2018: AB 2691 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 23, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2691 Jones-Sawyer By Beall
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
July 2, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2018: AB 2691 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
April 11, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Jones-Sawyer
Type:
Primary Sponsor