+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 765, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5114.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5117.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19).
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 18, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2687 Achadjian By Monning
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 1, 2016: AB 2687 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 20
April 19, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor