+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4368.).
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4838.)
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 7, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2687 Bocanegra By Mitchell
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
June 17, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 8, 2014: AB 2687 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
April 30, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor