+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5916.).
On August 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4686.).
On August 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5022.)
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
August 18, 2022: AB 2687 B. & P. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BERMAN
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 8, 2022: Special Consent AB2687 B. & P.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 25, 2022: AB 2687 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By FLORA
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
April 26, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Business and Professions
Type:
Primary Sponsor