+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 477, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4608.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5303.)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 21).
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 19, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2681 Dababneh By Correa
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2014: AB 2681 DABABNEH Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 21, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
May 13, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Dababneh
Type:
Primary Sponsor