+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 2. Page 5226.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4448.)
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on AGRI.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4218.)
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and AGRI.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2016: AB 2678 GRAY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 6
April 21, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 3
April 18, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Gray
Type:
Primary Sponsor