+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 22, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2