+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 19, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor