+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 10, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor