+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5988.).
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4908.).
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4611.)
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 4502.)
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
August 22, 2022: AB 2669 Nazarian Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 18, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2669 Nazarian By Kamlager Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 14, 2022: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 9, 2022: AB 2669 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 12
April 26, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor