+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 770, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 18. Page 6389.).
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4701.).
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 5228.)
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 21).
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 25, 2014: AB 2668 QUIRK-SILVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
August 21, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2668 Quirk-Silva By Beall
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
August 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2014: AB 2668 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
May 21, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
April 29, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor