+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7).
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 7, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor