+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 19, 2018: AB 2660 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
April 11, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
March 20, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Quirk
Type:
Primary Sponsor