+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 107, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4651.).
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4789.)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 30, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2654 Bonilla
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 8, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 12, 2016: AB 2654 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 19, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Bonilla
Type:
Primary Sponsor