+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2014: Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor