+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
On January 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
March 23, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor