+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On May 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 8, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor