+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 19. Page 7005.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5941.).
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 12).
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 5164.)
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 9).
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2018: AB 2640 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2640 Wood By McGuire
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 12, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 14, 2018: AB 2640 WOOD Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
May 9, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor