+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 22.).
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 5233.).
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 4943.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2022: AB 2632 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 7
August 30, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2632 Holden et al. By Skinner
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: AB 2632 Holden Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 8
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 19, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor