+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5040.)
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.)
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 5
May 31, 2016: AB 2630 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 27, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 20
April 18, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 6, 2016: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor