+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 294, Statutes of 2021.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2627.).
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.).
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1248.).
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1029.)
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23).
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
On January 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
September 1, 2021: AB 263 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
August 30, 2021: Special Consent AB263 Arambula et al. By Durazo Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2021: AB 263 Arambula Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
March 23, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8