+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26).
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 34. Page 5659.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 13, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2018: AB 2627 KALRA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor