+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 20, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor