+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 212, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4685.).
On August 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15).
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5026.)
On May 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
August 8, 2022: Special Consent AB2625
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 15, 2022: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 25, 2022: AB 2625 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
May 4, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor