+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (37)
On October 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 816, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 3282.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2696.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and EQ.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 1954.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
- In committee: Reconsideration granted.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and NAT. RES.
On February 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
On January 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 13, 2017: AB 262 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
September 11, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB262 Bonta et al. By Galgiani
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
September 1, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
June 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: AB 262 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 9
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 24, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 5, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3