+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 798, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3014.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2439.).
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1464.)
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19).
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 5, 2019: AB 262 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
September 3, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB262 Gloria et al. By Pan
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2019: AB 262 Gloria Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
April 10, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2